Streit et al v. Sanford Health et al
Plaintiff: Streit, Michael J. Streit and Misty Ericson
Defendant: Sanford Health, Anesthesia Physicians, Ltd., Sanford Clinic and Sanford Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2016cv04086
Filed: June 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2017 Filing 29 JUDGMENT of Dismissal. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/2/2017. (JLS)
November 1, 2017 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Sanford Clinic, Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center. (Haigh, Mark)
July 26, 2017 Filing 27 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL as to Anesthesia Physicians, Ltd., granting #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Anesthesia Physicians, Ltd. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/26/17. (DJP)
July 26, 2017 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Anesthesia Physicians, Ltd. by Anesthesia Physicians, Ltd.. (Sudbeck, Roger)
April 17, 2017 Filing 25 Amended Scheduling Order granting #24 Motion to Amend/Correct. Discovery due by 12/15/2017. Motions due by 1/19/2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/17/2017. (JLS)
April 14, 2017 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Scheduling Order by Misty Ericson, Michael J. Streit. (Johnson, Brendan)
October 31, 2016 Filing 23 AMENDED ANSWER to Separate Amended Answer of Defendants Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center, d/b/a Sanford USD Medical Center and Sanford Clinic #1 Complaint by Sanford Clinic, Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center. (Haigh, Mark)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/31/16. (DJP)
October 31, 2016 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Answer to Complaint, to Allow Defendants Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center, d/b/a Sanford USD Medical Center and Sanford Clinic to Amend Their Answer by Sanford Clinic, Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Separate Amended Answer of Sanford Defendants)(Haigh, Mark)
October 26, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Carol Hinton on behalf of Sanford Clinic, Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center. (Hinton, Melissa)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 10/15/2017. Discovery due by 11/15/2017 Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/14/16. (DJP)
September 13, 2016 Filing 18 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Sanford Clinic, Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center.(Haigh, Mark)
August 30, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Murphy on behalf of Anesthesia Physicians, Ltd.. (Murphy, Matthew)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/16/16. (DJP)
August 15, 2016 Filing 15 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand of Defendants Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center, d/b/a Sanford USD Medical Center and Sanford Clinic by Sanford Clinic, Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center. (Haigh, Mark)
August 8, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin E. Evans on behalf of Sanford Clinic, Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center. (Evans, Edwin)
August 4, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Haigh on behalf of Sanford Clinic, Sanford Health, Sanford Medical Center. (Haigh, Mark)
July 29, 2016 Filing 12 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Anesthesia Physicians, Ltd.. (Sudbeck, Roger)
July 20, 2016 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael J. Streit, Misty Ericson. Anesthesia Physicians, Ltd. waiver sent on 6/24/2016, answer due 8/23/2016. (Johnson, Brendan)
July 12, 2016 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael J. Streit, Misty Ericson. Sanford Medical Center waiver sent on 6/24/2016, answer due 8/23/2016. (Johnson, Brendan)
July 12, 2016 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael J. Streit, Misty Ericson. Sanford Health waiver sent on 6/24/2016, answer due 8/23/2016. (Johnson, Brendan)
July 12, 2016 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael J. Streit, Misty Ericson. Sanford Clinic waiver sent on 6/24/2016, answer due 8/23/2016. (Johnson, Brendan)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brandon E. Thompson for Misty Ericson,Brandon E. Thompson for Michael J. Streit. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/11/16. (SLW)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick S. Stoneking for Misty Ericson,Patrick S. Stoneking for Michael J. Streit. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/11/16. (SLW)
July 11, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Brandon E. Thompson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2287810) by Misty Ericson, Michael J. Streit. (Johnson, Brendan)
July 11, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Patrick S. Stoneking to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2287786) by Misty Ericson, Michael J. Streit. (Johnson, Brendan)
June 21, 2016 Filing 3 Filing Fee Received: Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400040383. (SLW)
June 21, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW)
June 21, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Michael J. Streit, Misty Ericson. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streit et al v. Sanford Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Streit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Streit
Represented By: Patrick S. Stoneking
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: John P. Blackburn
Represented By: Brandon E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Ericson
Represented By: Patrick S. Stoneking
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: John P. Blackburn
Represented By: Brandon E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Health
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Melissa C. Hinton
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anesthesia Physicians, Ltd.
Represented By: Roger A. Sudbeck
Represented By: Matthew D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Clinic
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Melissa C. Hinton
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Medical Center
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Melissa C. Hinton
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?