Thunder Hawk-Gallardo v. USM Name Unknown et al
Plaintiff: Frank Thunder Hawk-Gallardo
Defendant: USM Name Unknown, Wendling and Dre Red Feather
Case Number: 4:2017cv04001
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting in full 66 Report and Recommendation; overruling 67 , 68 Objections to Report and Recommendation. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/18//18. (DJP)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 44 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/9/17. (DJP)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Protective Order; denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot 31 Motion for Discovery. Defendant must file his motion for summary judgment by December 1, 2017. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/19/17. (DJP)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/16/2017. (JLS)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot 9 Motion For Rule 4(m) For Summons Form and USM 285 Form ; denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/6/2017. (JLS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thunder Hawk-Gallardo v. USM Name Unknown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Thunder Hawk-Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USM Name Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dre Red Feather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?