Wilson v. Dooley et al
Petitioner: Scott Leroy Wilson
Respondent: Robert Dooley and The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Case Number: 4:2017cv04057
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Yankton
Presiding Judge: Veronica L. Duffy
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss; adopting in full 15 Report and Recommendation; overruling 16 Objection to Report and Recommendation. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/19/17. (DJP)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 6/5/2015. (CG)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service upon respondents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 4/27/2017. (CG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Dooley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Leroy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?