Heritage Home for Funerals Inc. v. Heritage Cremation Provider, LLC
Plaintiff: Heritage Home for Funerals Inc.
Defendant: Heritage Cremation Provider, LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv04086
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/17/19. (SKK) Modified on 7/17/2019 sent to Heritage Cremation Provider, LLC (SKK).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Contempt and to Enforce the Default Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/9/19. (SKK)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/22/19. (SKK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heritage Home for Funerals Inc. v. Heritage Cremation Provider, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Home for Funerals Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Frankman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Cremation Provider, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?