The Water Works Board of the City of Birmingham et al v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: The Water Works Board of the City of Birmingham, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Employees' Retirement Plan, Atlantic Global Yield Opportunity Master Fund, L.P and Atlantic Global Yield Opportunity Fund, L.P.
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 4:2017cv04113
Filed: August 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JUDGMENT of Dismissal Between Plaintiff The Water Works Board of the City of Birmingham and Plaintiff Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Employees and Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 09/16/2020. (MSB)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 98 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion to Exclude; denying 112 Motion to Sever. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 06/10/2020. (SLW)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/17/18. (SLW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Water Works Board of the City of Birmingham et al v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Water Works Board of the City of Birmingham
Represented By: Patrick T. Dougherty
Represented By: Jessica A. Murzyn
Represented By: Milton C. Ragsdale
Represented By: John G. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Employees' Retirement Plan
Represented By: Patrick T. Dougherty
Represented By: Jessica A. Murzyn
Represented By: Milton C. Ragsdale
Represented By: John G. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Global Yield Opportunity Master Fund, L.P
Represented By: Patrick T. Dougherty
Represented By: Jessica A. Murzyn
Represented By: Milton C. Ragsdale
Represented By: John G. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Global Yield Opportunity Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Patrick T. Dougherty
Represented By: Jessica A. Murzyn
Represented By: Milton C. Ragsdale
Represented By: John G. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?