Shaw v. Kaemingk et al
Plaintiff: James Elmer Shaw
Defendant: Dennis Kaemingk, Robert Dooley, Darin Young, Jennifer Drieske, Jennifer Stanwick-Klemik, Troy Ponto, Arthor Alcock, David Lentsch, Derrick Bieber, Al Madson, Josh Kemink, Tammi Mertins-Jones, Elizabeth Vitetia, Britiney Ulmer, Melissa Maturan, Steve Baker, Linda Miller-Hunhoff, Sharron Keiman, J. Storuick, Derek Anderson, Preston Perrett, Judy Plooster-Jacobs, Lisa Frasier, Nick Reddman, Mary Carpenter, Er Regier, Brad Adams, Jessica Schreurs, Heather Bowers, Unknown Department of Health/Correctional Health Service (DOH/CHS) Employees, Yankton Medical Clinical, P.C., Brent Adams, CBM Correctional Food Services, John Tweirweiller, Unknown CBM Employees, Delmer Walter, Catherine Schlimgen, Mark Bidney and Global Tel*Link
Case Number: 4:2017cv04116
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Aurora
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 225 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/20/20. Mailed to plaintiff. (SLW)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 193 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 201 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 214 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 218 Motion for Hearing; granting 219 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/15/2020. (Mailed to James Shaw) (JLS)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting 236 Motion to Seal Documents. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/9/2020. (Mailed to Shaw via US Postal Service) (JLS)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying 141 Motion for TRO; denying 141 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/2/19. Mailed to James Shaw via US Postal Service. (JLS)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying 147 Motion to Compel; denying 149 Motion to Compel; denying 151 Motion to Compel; denying 153 Motion to Compel; denying 155 Motion to Compel; denying 157 Motion to Compel; denying 159 Motion to Compel; denying [161 ] Motion to Compel; denying 163 Motion to Compel; denying 165 Motion to Compel; denying 167 Motion to Compel; denying 182 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot 185 Motion to Extend Deadlines ( Discovery due by 12/20/2019, Motio ns due by 1/7/2020.); denying as moot 187 Motion to Extend Deadlines ( Discovery due by 12/20/2019, Motions due by 1/7/2020.); denying as moot 188 Motion for Joinder. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/21/2019. Mailed to Plaintiff. (MSB)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Dennis Kaemingk, Delmer Walter, Arthor Alcock, Melissa Maturan, Troy Ponto, Nick Anderson, Linda Miller-Hunhoff, Nick Reddman, Je nnifer Drieske, Tammi Mertins-Jones, Er Regier, Preston Perrett, Derrick Bieber, Mary Carpenter, Darin Young, Jessica Schreurs, Elizabeth Vitetta, Lisa Frasier, Steve Baker, Jordan Storevik, Josh Klemik, Al Madson, Heather Bowers, Davi d Lentsch, Jennifer Stanwick-Klemik, Britiney Ulmer, Robert Dooley, denying as moot 117 MOTION to Extend filed by James Elmer Shaw, denying 73 MOTION for Order filed by James Elmer Shaw, denying 74 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION to Compe l filed by James Elmer Shaw, denying 69 MOTION for Reconsideration re 67 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion to Set Aside Default,, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Motion to Extend, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order filed by James Elmer Shaw, denying 132 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by James Elmer Shaw. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/29/19. (SKK)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 85 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by CBM Defendants. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/27/19. Sent to James Elmer Shaw via USPS. (SKK)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 6 Motion for Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/18/18. (DJP)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/2/18. (JLS)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Amend, Amended answer due 6/27/18; granting 55 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 56 Motion for Protective Order; denying 62 Motion for Default Judgment; denying as moot 65 Motion to Extend ; granting 10 Motion re Service; denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/19/18. (SLW)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing Complaint in Part and Directing Service. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/28/2017. (JLS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Kaemingk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Elmer Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Kaemingk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Drieske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Stanwick-Klemik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Ponto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthor Alcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lentsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Bieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Madson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Kemink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammi Mertins-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Vitetia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britiney Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Maturan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Miller-Hunhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharron Keiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Storuick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Perrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Plooster-Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Reddman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Er Regier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Schreurs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Department of Health/Correctional Health Service (DOH/CHS) Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yankton Medical Clinical, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBM Correctional Food Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tweirweiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown CBM Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmer Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Schlimgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bidney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Tel*Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?