Hendrickson v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Hendrickson
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2017cv04173
Filed: December 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend/Correct and entering amended order granting plaintiff's motion for attorneys fees and costs 26 . Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 2/26/2019. (CG)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part 26 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 2/15/2019. (CG)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 16 Motion to Reverse. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 11/14/2018. (CG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrickson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Hendrickson
Represented By: Catherine G. Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?