Ball v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Randy Ball
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv04008
Filed: January 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Kingsbury
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Compel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 09/04/2020. (MSB)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED ORDER re 28 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Federal Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/15/2019. (CLR)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/26/19. (SRA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Ball
Represented By: Scott G. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?