Loring v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Loring
Defendant: United States of America, U.S. Department of Justice and Executive Office for United States Attorney's General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv04034
Filed: April 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 111 MOTION for Reconsideration Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 04/14/2020. cc: mailed to Daniel Loring via USPS (KLE)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 73 Motion for Sanctions; denying 78 Motion to Compel; denying 80 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 81 Motion ; denying 83 Motion ; denying 95 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting with prejudice 97 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 104 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 03/17/2020. Mailed to Daniel Loring via USPS (KLE)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 28 Motion ; denying 29 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 30 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part 23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/18/18. (mailed to Mr. Loring)(JLS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loring v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Loring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for United States Attorney's General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?