Ruff v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sherry L. Ruff
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2018cv04057
Filed: May 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Davison
Presiding Judge: Veronica L. Duffy
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER on plaintiff's motions for attorney's fees and costs. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 2/15/2019. (CG)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 22 and 27 Motions for Attorney Fees. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 2/11/2019. (CG)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 1/18/19. (SST)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 5/22/2018. (CG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruff v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry L. Ruff
Represented By: Steven R. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?