Casaday v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Earl B. Casaday, Sr.
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. and Adriann Johnson
Case Number: 4:2018cv04086
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim by Earl B. Casaday, Sr. (LaFleur-Sayler, Sabrina) Modified text on 8/23/2018 (DJP).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The parties' discovery report is due 9/27/18. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/8/18. (DJP)
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.'s Crossclaim by Adriann Johnson. (Nelsen, Derek) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (DJP).
August 7, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Adriann Johnson. (Nelsen, Derek)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/1/18. (JLS)
August 1, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Joyce, Meghann)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 The Prudential Insurance Company of America's ANSWER to #4 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, CROSSCLAIM for Interpleader against Adriann Johnson, COUNTERCLAIM against Earl B. Casaday, Sr by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1) - Group Policy and Amendments, #2 Exhibit A (Part 2) - Group Policy and Amendments, #3 Exhibit B - Servicemembers Group Life Insurance Election and Cert of Coverage, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Death, #5 Exhibit D - Claim for Death Benefits Johnson, #6 Exhibit E - Emails and Text re Change of Beneficiary, #7 Exhibit F - Claim for Death Benefits Casaday, #8 Exhibit G - Servicemembers Group Life Insurance Election and Cert of Coverage) (Joyce, Meghann) Modified to add link on 8/2/2018 (DJP).
July 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Lee LaFleur-Sayler on behalf of Earl B. Casaday, Sr. (LaFleur-Sayler, Sabrina)
July 28, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Adriann Johnson. (Nelsen, Derek) Modified to add link on 7/30/2018 (DJP).
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. of Consent to Removal. (Joyce, Meghann)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghann M. Joyce on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Joyce, Meghann)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET (Nelsen, Derek)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed in shell case on 7/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - state court pleadings)(Nelsen, Derek) Modified on 7/19/2018 (DJP).
July 18, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Nelsen, Derek)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Filing Fee Received from Adriann Johnson. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2832301. (DJP)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP) Modified on 7/19/2018 (DJP).
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adriann Johnson from Lincoln County, case number Unknown. Filed in shell case on 7/18/19. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Verified Complaint for Declaratory Judgment)(DJP) Modified on 7/19/2018 (DJP). Modified on 7/19/2018 (DJP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casaday v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Meghann M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriann Johnson
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Represented By: Molly K. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl B. Casaday, Sr.
Represented By: Sabrina Lee LaFleur-Sayler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?