Whittle v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Sean K. Whittle
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2018cv04095
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Davison
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy to conduct all proceedings and to enter judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/19/18. (DJP)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (MWT)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of Nancy Berryhill. (Druley (USA), Delia)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to USA. 1 original summons, A085 form, and Rule 73 memo delivered via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Berryhill, #2 AO85 Form)(JLS)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/7/2018. (CG)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sean K. Whittle. (JLS)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Sean K. Whittle. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittle v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean K. Whittle
Represented By: Steven R. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?