Goldstein v. Avera McKennan Hospital et al

Plaintiff: David Scott Goldstein
Defendant: Hillary Turner, MD, Jim Mirsrahi, D. Francisco Alvarado-Ramy, Beth Bell and Avera McKennan Hospital
Case Number: 4:2018cv04101
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to File a Notice of Appeal. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/28/18. (SLW)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Deadline to file a notice of appeal by David Scott Goldstein. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documents, #2 Envelope postmarked 9/28/18) (SLW)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 JUDGMENT Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/22/18. (SLW)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/22/18. (SLW)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet and CM/ECF Pro Se Litigant Application Form sent by Clerk's Office to Plaintiff. (DJP)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by David Scott Goldstein. (DJP)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Scott Goldstein. (DJP)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by David Scott Goldstein. (Attachments: #1 Env postmarked 8/16/18) (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstein v. Avera McKennan Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Turner, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Mirsrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Francisco Alvarado-Ramy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avera McKennan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scott Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?