Nettles v. Hilton Worldwide, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Angela Nettles
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., River Greenway Hospitality, LLC, ABC Limited Liability Companies 21 through 30, Main and Main, L.L.C. and Roe Corporations 11 through 20
Case Number: 4:2018cv04102
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2019 Motions due by 10/1/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 02:30 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/25/18. (SLW)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christian M. Morris. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/18/18. (DJP)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 Discovery Report re #10 Order for Discovery Report of Parties Rule 26 Meetng by Angela Nettles. Related document: #10 Order for Discovery Report.(Landon, Stephen)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Christian M. Morris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2860624) by Angela Nettles. (Landon, Stephen) Modified on 9/17/2018 to reflect payment from doc #7 (SLW).
September 17, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Landon, Stephen)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(DJP)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Tobin, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Hilton Worldwide, Inc. on 8-28-18 (Landon, Stephen)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Attorney Christian M. Morris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2860624) by Angela Nettles. (Landon, Stephen) Modified on 9/17/2018 (SAC).
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Main and Main, LLC on 8-20-18, filed by Angela Nettles. (Landon, Stephen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of River Greenway Hospitality LLC served on River Greenway Hospitality, LLC on 8-20-18, filed by Angela Nettles. (Landon, Stephen)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Main and Main, L.L.C., River Greenway Hospitality, LLC. 3 original summons, 4 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (JLS)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Filing Fee Received from Angela Nettles. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400047759. (JLS)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Angela Nettles. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nettles v. Hilton Worldwide, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Greenway Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Limited Liability Companies 21 through 30
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main and Main, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Corporations 11 through 20
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Nettles
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Represented By: Christian M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?