Pogany v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Imelda I. Pogany
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2018cv04103
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol no longer assigned to case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/10/18. (DJP) Modified on 10/10/2018 (DJP).
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Nancy Berryhill and Imelda I. Pogany. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (MWT) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/9/2018) (MWT).
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan K. Roche on behalf of Nancy Berryhill. (Roche, Meghan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill in their official capacities. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, #2 AO85 Form)(SAC)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing summons be issued for service upon defendant. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/21/2018. (CG)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Imelda I. Pogany. (JLS)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Imelda I. Pogany. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pogany v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imelda I. Pogany
Represented By: Steven R. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?