H.S. v. Wellmark of South Dakota Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Olivia H.S.
Defendant: Wellmark, Inc. and Wellmark of South Dakota Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv04111
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Snyder on behalf of Wellmark of South Dakota Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Snyder, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wellmark of South Dakota Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by All Defendants. (Eden, Shane)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Schulte on behalf of Wellmark of South Dakota Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Schulte, Eric)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wellmark of South Dakota Inc. answer due 10/29/2018; Wellmark, Inc. answer due 10/29/2018.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/10/18. (SLW)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Wellmark of South Dakota Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane E. Eden on behalf of Wellmark of South Dakota Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wellmark of South Dakota Inc., Wellmark, Inc. Original summons, A085, and Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 AO85, #2 Rule 73 Memo)(SLT)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Filing Fee Received from Olivia H.S.. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #SDX500005410. (SLT)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLT)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Olivia H.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wellmark SD Pre-certification of medical necessity - February 17,2016, #2 Exhibit 2 - Olivia's father letter to Wellmark SD - June 21, 2016, #3 Exhibit 3 - William Holmes, MD Report - July 20, 2016, #4 Exhibit 4 - Wellmark SD Letter refusing to overturn denial - August 3, 2016, #5 Exhibit 5 - Olivia's father letter to Wellmark SD - August 10, 2016, #6 Exhibit 6 - Wellmark SD letter with Coverage Manual - August 19, 2016, #7 Exhibit 7 - Olivia's father letter to Wellmark SD - October 26, 2016, #8 Exhibit 8 - Olivia's father letter to Wellmark SD - October 28, 2016, #9 Exhibit 9 - Wellmark SD letter with Holmes-Rosenfeld Reports - December 22, 2016) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.S. v. Wellmark of South Dakota Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Snyder
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark of South Dakota Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Snyder
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia H.S.
Represented By: Michael C. Abourezk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?