Nyreen v. POET, LLC

Plaintiff: Barb Anne Nyreen
Defendant: POET, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv04118
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Motion Response re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) Modified on 11/16/2018 (SLT).
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lilian Doan Davis for POET, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/06/2018. (KLE)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott M. Gilbert for POET, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/06/2018. (KLE)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Barb Anne Nyreen. (KLE)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Lilian Davis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2904780) by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Scott M. Gilbert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2904773) by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) AND ADDITIONAL AND/OR AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by POET, LLC . (Shattuck, Timothy)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by POET, LLC TO PLAINTIFF OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Shattuck, Timothy)
September 19, 2018 Filing Fee Received from POET, LLC. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2879707. (JLS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by POET, LLC. Filed in shell case on 9/19/18. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyreen v. POET, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barb Anne Nyreen
Represented By: David J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POET, LLC
Represented By: Timothy R. Shattuck
Represented By: Scott M. Gilbert
Represented By: Lilian Doan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?