LaFleur v. Krebs et al

Plaintiff: Dr. Terry Lee LaFleur
Defendant: Lora Hubbel, Shantel Krebs, Joel Bergan, Frank Fluckiger, Gordon Howie, Dan Lederman, Marilee Roose and Matt Johnson
Case Number: 4:2018cv04125
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terry Lee LaFleur. (DJP)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; denying #6 Motion for Recusal; denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/02/2018. (LH)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Terry Lee LaFleur. (Attachments: #1 Env postmarked 10/9/18) (DJP)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 MOTION for Recusal filed by Terry Lee LaFleur. (SLW)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Recusal by Terry Lee LaFleur. (SLW)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 New Case LETTER with enclosed copy of the docket sheet and the pro se litigant application form sent by Clerk's Office to Terry LaFleur. (JLS)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terry Lee LaFleur. (JLS)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Terry Lee LaFleur. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFleur v. Krebs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lora Hubbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantel Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Bergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Fluckiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilee Roose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Terry Lee LaFleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?