Huls et al v. Meyer et al

Plaintiff: Mark A. Huls, David L. Skoglund, Catherine M. Peterson and Steven E. Peterson
Defendant: David M. Meyer and Nancy R. Meyer
Case Number: 4:2018cv04126
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: South Dakota District Court
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff's #3 Motion to Remand and denying plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and sanctions. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/25/2018. (SAC)
October 22, 2018 15 Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2018 re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by Steven E. Peterson, David L. Skoglund, Mark A. Huls, Catherine M. Peterson before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. (Court Reporter: Jill Connelly) (JLS)
October 18, 2018 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Michael E. Unke Itemized Attorney Fees) (Unke, Michael)
October 18, 2018 13 REPLY to Motion Response re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 David Meyer Financial Plan, #2 David Skoglund Deposition Exhibit 50 Information, #3 Magnum 43, LLC appraisal letter, #4 Windmill Ridge, LLC appraisal letter, #5 Rawhide, LLC appraisal letter, #6 Remington, LLC appraisal letter, #7 David Meyer Balance Sheet, #8 Transcript of complete Motion Hearing September 14, 2018) (Unke, Michael)
October 18, 2018 12 REPLY to Motion Response re #4 MOTION for Hearing Expedited filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Order After Hearing Held September 14, 2018, #2 Certified Letter September 15, 2017 to Defendants) (Unke, Michael)
October 16, 2018 11 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court set for 10/22/2018 at 01:00 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/16/18. (JLS)
October 16, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE EXPEDITED REPLY. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/16/18. (DJP)
October 15, 2018 9 RESPONSE to #4 Motion for Hearing filed by All Defendants. (Rahn, Timothy)
October 15, 2018 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Rahn, Timothy)
October 11, 2018 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Rahn, Timothy)
October 10, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO FILE AN EXPEDITED RESPONSE. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/10/18. (DJP)
October 9, 2018 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions, #4 MOTION for Hearing Expedited filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Original Complaint, #2 Answer & Counterclaim, #3 Verified Amended Complaint, #4 Order After Hearing Held September 14, 2018) (Unke, Michael)
October 9, 2018 4 MOTION for Hearing Expedited by Mark A. Huls, Catherine M. Peterson, Steven E. Peterson, David L. Skoglund. (Unke, Michael)
October 9, 2018 3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions by Mark A. Huls, Catherine M. Peterson, Steven E. Peterson, David L. Skoglund. (Unke, Michael)
September 27, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
September 27, 2018 Filing Fee Received from David M. Meyer, Nancy R. Meyer. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2885309. (JLS)
September 27, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial Circuit Court in McCook County, South Dakota, case number 44CIV18-000004. Filed in shell case on 9/27/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons, #2 Exhibit 2-Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-Sheriff's Return of Personal Service, #4 Exhibit 4- Answer and Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit 5-Reply to Counterclaim, #6 Exhibit 6-Certificate of Service, #7 Exhibit 7- Certificate of Service, #8 Exhibit 8- Certificate of Service, #9 Exhibit 9- Motion to Compel, #10 Exhibit 10- Motion to Establish a Scheduling Order and Other Further Relief, #11 Exhibit 11- Affidavit of M. Unke, #12 Exhibit 12- Notice of Motions Hearing, #13 Exhibit 13- Exhibit 1 filed at Motions Hearing, #14 Exhibit 14- Exhibit 1 Volume 2 filed at Motions Hearing, #15 Exhibit 15- Order denied, #16 Exhibit 16- Order, #17 Exhibit 17- Notice of Entry, #18 Exhibit 18- Notice of Deposition of D. Meyer, #19 Exhibit 19- Notice of Deposition of M. Huls, #20 Exhibit 20- Notice of Deposition of S. Peterson, #21 Exhibit 21- Notice of Deposition of D. Skoglund, #22 Exhibit 22- Notice of Deposition of J. Grady, #23 Exhibit 23-Notice of Deposition of K.Blagg, #24 Exhibit 24- Motion to Amend Complaint, #25 Exhibit 25- Brief in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint, #26 Exhibit 26- Notice of Hearing, #27 Exhibit 27- Motion for Trial Date, #28 Exhibit 28- Motion to Find Defendants in Contempt of Court, #29 Exhibit 29- Affidavit of M. Unke, #30 Exhibit 30- Notice of Hearing, #31 Exhibit 31- Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to find Defendants in Contempt of Court, #32 Exhibit 32- Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs motion to amend complaint, #33 Exhibit 33- Affidavit for Attorneys Fees, #34 Exhibit 34- Veryified Amended Complaint, #35 Exhibit 35- Order After Hearing Held September 14,2018, #36 Exhibit 36- Deposition Transcript, #37 Exhibit 37- Lease Agreement)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huls et al v. Meyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Meyer
Represented By: Timothy R. Rahn
Represented By: Daniel R. Fritz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy R. Meyer
Represented By: Timothy R. Rahn
Represented By: Daniel R. Fritz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Huls
Represented By: Michael E. Unke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Skoglund
Represented By: Michael E. Unke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine M. Peterson
Represented By: Michael E. Unke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E. Peterson
Represented By: Michael E. Unke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?