Hoffman et al v. MJC America, LTD et al
Plaintiff: Scott Hoffman and Lynda Hoffman
Defendant: HONG KONG GREE ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE SALES, LTD, MJC AMERICA, LTD, GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI and GREE USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv04169
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to DISMISS For Insufficient Service of Process or, in the Alternative, Motion to Quash filed by Lynda Hoffman, Scott Hoffman. (Johnson, Steven)
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Gray on behalf of All Defendants. (Gray, John)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Scott Hoffman, Lynda Hoffman. (Johnson, Steven)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF by Defendants GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI, HONG KONG GREE ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE SALES, LTD re #10 MOTION to DISMISS For Insufficient Service of Process or, in the Alternative, Motion to Quash (Wright, Jeff)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS For Insufficient Service of Process or, in the Alternative, Motion to Quash by GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI, HONG KONG GREE ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE SALES, LTD. (Wright, Jeff)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GREE USA, Inc., MJC AMERICA, LTD. (Wright, Jeff)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Hoffman, Lynda Hoffman. (Johnson, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Hoffman, Lynda Hoffman. GREE USA, Inc. served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Johnson, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Hoffman, Lynda Hoffman. HONG KONG GREE ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE SALES, LTD served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Johnson, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Hoffman, Lynda Hoffman. GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Johnson, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Hoffman, Lynda Hoffman. MJC AMERICA, LTD served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Johnson, Steven)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 4 original summons, 6 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (DLC)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Filing Fee Received from Lynda Hoffman, Scott Hoffman. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400048843. (DLC)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Scott Hoffman, Lynda Hoffman. (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman et al v. MJC America, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONG KONG GREE ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE SALES, LTD
Represented By: John C. Gray
Represented By: Jeff W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC AMERICA, LTD
Represented By: John C. Gray
Represented By: Jeff W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI
Represented By: John C. Gray
Represented By: Jeff W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE USA, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Gray
Represented By: Jeff W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hoffman
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Steven M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Hoffman
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Steven M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?