Sanow v. Sammons Financial Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carie C. Sanow
Defendant: Sammons Financial Group, Inc. and Midland National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv04173
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Midland National Life Insurance Company. 1 original summons delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (SAC)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Carie C. Sanow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Notice of Right to Sue) (Raymond, Cheri)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #11 Amended Document was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Raymond, Cheri)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Carie C. Sanow. (Raymond, Cheri)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Carie C. Sanow. Amendment to #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of the Notice of Right to Sue) (Raymond, Cheri) Modified on 2/15/2019 (SAC).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ann Holden Kendell for Sammons Financial Group, Inc. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 2/12/2019. (SLT)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sammons Financial Group, Inc. answer due 2/8/2019.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 2/8/2019. (SLT)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Sammons Financial Group, Inc.. (Schulte, Eric)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sammons Financial Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Consolidated Investment Services, Inc. for Sammons Financial Group, Inc.. (Schulte, Eric)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Ann Holden Kendell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2983381) by Sammons Financial Group, Inc.. (Schulte, Eric)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sammons Financial Group, Inc.. (Schulte, Eric)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Sammons Financial Group, Inc. served on 01/09/2019. (Raymond, Cheri)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for Sammons Financial Group, Inc. 1 original summons, 1 A085, and 1 Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery.(Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SST) Modified text on 12/27/2018 (SST).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Filing Fee Received from Carie C. Sanow. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400048931. (SST) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/28/2018) (SST).
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carie C. Sanow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue) (SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanow v. Sammons Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammons Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ann Holden Kendell
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carie C. Sanow
Represented By: Cheri S. Raymond
Represented By: Jennifer Suich Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?