Caballero v. Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias de Columbia et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Caballero
Defendant: Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias de Columbia, Ejercito de Liberacion Nacional, Revolutionary Armed Forces of Columbia, FARC-EP, National Liberation Army, ELN and The Norte de Valle Cartel
Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Intervenor: Carolyn Pescatore, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith Janis, Thomas Howes, Josh Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Jada Pescatore, Michael I. Janis, Jordan Pescatore, John Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Marc Gonsalves, Olivia Pescatore and Keith Stansell
Case Number: 4:2019cv04011
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Intervene by Anti-Terrorism Act Judgment Holders IN OPPOSITION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Judgment Order, #2 Exhibit Prodira Initial Brief, #3 Exhibit Mr. Caballero's Answer Brief, #4 Exhibit Prodira Reply Brief, #5 Exhibit Prodira Motion to Dissolve Garnishment, #6 Exhibit Omnibus Order, #7 Exhibit Turnover Judgment, #8 Exhibit District Court of Appeal, #9 Exhibit Motion for Declaration with Exhibits, #10 Exhibit Order Declaring Banco Continental an Agency and Instrumentality) (Myers, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Certification of Sworn Declaration of Dr. Bruce Bagley with corresponding Exhibit A, Motion for Declaration with corresponding Exhibits A and B, Order for Declaration, Summons for Garnishment, Admission of Service, Notice of Filing CV with corresponding attachment OF LEON N. PATRICIOS served on The Norte de Valle Cartel on January 19, 2019, filed by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Envelope, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Exhibit Envelope, #4 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Myers, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Certification of Sworn Declaration of Dr. Bruce Bagley with corresponding Exhibit A, Motion for Declaration with corresponding Exhibits A and B, Order for Declaration, Summons for Garnishment, Admission of Service, Notice of Filing CV with corresponding attachment OF LEON N. PATRICIOS served on Ejercito de Liberacion Nacional on January 19, 2019, filed by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ELN's Website)(Myers, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Certification of Sworn Declaration of Dr. Bruce Bagley with corresponding Exhibit A, Motion for Declaration with corresponding Exhibits A and B, Order for Declaration, Summons for Garnishment, Admission of Service, Notice of Filing CV with corresponding attachment OF LEON N. PATRICIOS served on Banco Continental, S.A. on January 22, 2019, filed by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Envelope, #2 Exhibit First Class International Mail Receipt, #3 Exhibit FedEx International Mail Receipt, #4 Exhibit Registered Mail Receipt, #5 Exhibit Envelope)(Myers, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Certification of Sworn Declaration of Dr. Bruce Bagley with corresponding Exhibit A, Motion for Declaration with corresponding Exhibits A and B, Order for Declaration, Summons for Garnishment, Admission of Service, Notice of Filing CV with corresponding attachment OF LEON N. PATRICIOS served on Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias de Colombia on January 19, 2019, filed by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mail Confirmation)(Myers, James)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph I. Zumpano for Antonio Caballero. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/26/19. (SLW)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Leon N. Patricios for Antonio Caballero. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/26/19. (SLW)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Antonio Caballero THAT PLAINTIFF ELECTS TO TAKE ISSUE WITH GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO'S ANSWER. (Myers, James)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Leon N. Patricios to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2996140) by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Leon N. Patricios) (Myers, James)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Joseph I. Zumpano to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2996133) by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Joseph) (Myers, James)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Intervene by Anti-Terrorism Act Judgment Holders filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith as personal rep Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carol Harpster as rep Pescatore, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Motion to Dismiss) (Billion, Timothy)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Intervene by Anti-Terrorism Act Judgment Holders by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith as personal rep Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carol Harpster as rep Pescatore, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy W. Billion on behalf of Olivia Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Carol Harpster as representative of estate of Frank Pescatore, Sr. Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, John Pescatore, Carolyn Pescatore, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Judith as personal representative and sole heir of the estate of Greer Janis Janis, Michael I. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis. (Billion, Timothy)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibit D filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Garnishment Disclosure on Garnishment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Stansell Writ, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Pescatore Writ) (Rahn, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Filing Fee Received from Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2966958. (SLW)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from Second Judicial Circuit, Minnehaha County, case number 49CIV18-003415. Filed in shell case on 1/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment in the Minnehaha Action, #2 Exhibit B- Second Amended Complaint in the Florida Action, #3 Exhibit C- Final Judgment in the Florida Action, #4 Exhibit D- Summons for Garnishment, #5 Exhibit E- Admission of Serivce, #6 Exhibit F- Stansell v. Revolutionary Armed Forces of Columbia, #7 Exhibit G- Writ of Execution, #8 Exhibit H- Pescatore Memorandum Opinion, #9 Exhibit I- Pescatore Writ of Attachment)(SLW) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/22/2019) (SLW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caballero v. Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias de Columbia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias de Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ejercito de Liberacion Nacional
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revolutionary Armed Forces of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARC-EP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Liberation Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Norte de Valle Cartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Caballero
Represented By: Joshua D. Zellmer
Represented By: James R. Myers
Represented By: Joseph I. Zumpano
Represented By: Leon N. Patricios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel R. Fritz, II
Represented By: Timothy R. Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Carolyn Pescatore
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jonathan N. Janis
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Judith Janis
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Thomas Howes
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Josh Pescatore
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jarrod Pescatore
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Carol Pescatore Harpster
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jada Pescatore
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Michael I. Janis
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jordan Pescatore
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: John Pescatore
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Richard Pescatore
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Marc Gonsalves
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Olivia Pescatore
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Keith Stansell
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?