Creative Surfaces, Inc. v. Bitco National Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Creative Surfaces, Inc.
Defendant: Bitco National Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04018
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint by Creative Surfaces, Inc.. (Show, Sara)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Creative Surfaces, Inc.. (Show, Sara) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (SST).
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 03/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(KLE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Creative Surfaces, Inc. by Bitco National Insurance Company. (Deinert, Ryland)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Creative Surfaces, Inc.. Bitco National Insurance Company waiver sent on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Abdallah, Scott)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bitco National Insurance Company. 1 original summons, 2 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (KLE)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX400049137) filed by Creative Surfaces, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A: 5 Commerical Policies from Bitco) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creative Surfaces, Inc. v. Bitco National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitco National Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryland L. Deinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Surfaces, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Scott A. Abdallah
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?