Palmer et al v. 12th Street Auto Care Center
Plaintiff: Charles Johnson and Deon Palmer
Defendant: 12th Street Auto Care Center
Case Number: 4:2019cv04039
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Mail sent to Deon Palmer was returned as undeliverable. #6 Order Reassigning Case was returned. (SKK)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier no longer assigned to case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on February 21, 2019. (DLC) Copy sent to Deon Palmer on 2/21/2019 (DLC).
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 New Case LETTER with enclosed AO 239 and Docket Sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Deon Palmer and Charles Johnson. (DLC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Electronically File Documents. Pro se party Charles Johnson will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DLC) Modified Docket Text on 2/20/2019 (DLC).
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION by Plaintiff Deon Palmer (DLC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Deon Palmer, Charles Johnson. (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer et al v. 12th Street Auto Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 12th Street Auto Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?