Thompson v. Maguire Iron, Inc.
Plaintiff: Corissa Thompson
Defendant: Maguire Iron, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04043
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/26/2019. (SLT)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Maguire Iron, Inc.. (Raymond, Cheri)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Maguire Iron, Inc.. (Raymond, Cheri)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corissa Thompson. (Pochop, Stephanie)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #10 Summons Returned Executed was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Pochop, Stephanie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corissa Thompson. Maguire Iron, Inc. served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Pochop, Stephanie) Modified on 3/18/2019 (SAC).
March 15, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #9 Return of Service Executed was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Pochop, Stephanie)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Maguire Iron, Inc. on March 1, 2019 (Pochop, Stephanie) Modified to correct who was served on 3/14/2019 (SLW). Modified on 3/18/2019 (SAC).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven A. Smith. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/27/2019. (SLT)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew A. Frank. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/27/2019. (SLT)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Maguire Iron, Inc. 1 original summons, 1 A085, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Maguire Iron, Inc., #2 AO85 Form)(SAC)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Steven Andrew Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2998671) by Corissa Thompson. (Pochop, Stephanie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Matthew A. Frank to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2998605) by Corissa Thompson. (Pochop, Stephanie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Corissa Thompson. (Pochop, Stephanie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 73 MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 AO85)(SLT)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-2996388) filed by Corissa Thompson. (SLT) Modified on 2/22/2019 filed in shell case on 2/22/2019 (SLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Maguire Iron, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corissa Thompson
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Represented By: Matthew A. Frank
Represented By: Steven A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maguire Iron, Inc.
Represented By: Cheri S. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?