Bollock v. Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mary Bollock
Defendant: Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04048
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 Discovery Report by Mary Bollock.(Pochop, Stephanie)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Counsel sent from United States District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol dated 04/22/2019 with enclosure. (KLE)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 04/22/2019. (KLE)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc.. (Marso, Lisa)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc.. (Marso, Lisa)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Hansen Marso on behalf of Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc.. (Marso, Lisa)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc.. Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Marso, Lisa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc. Summmons, AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 A0 85)(SST)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Mary Bollock. (Pochop, Stephanie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3001238) filed by Mary Bollock in shell case on 03/01/2019. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollock v. Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bollock
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyds' Gunstock Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Hansen Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?