Arnold v. TeamCare et al

Plaintiff: Katherine A. Arnold
Defendant: TeamCare and Trustees of the Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund
Case Number: 4:2019cv04055
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (E.R.I.S.A.)
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Feist, Jordan)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Katherine A. Arnold. (Meader, Joseph)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2019 Motions due by 9/13/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/12/19. (DJP)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 Discovery Report by TeamCare, Trustees of the Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund.(Feist, Jordan)
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #9 Rule 26 Disclosures was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Feist, Jordan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) RULE 26 Disclosures by TeamCare (Feist, Jordan) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (JLS).
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Meader on behalf of Katherine A. Arnold. (Meader, Joseph)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/6/19. Mailed copy to Plaintiff 3/6/19(DJP)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caitlin M. McNulty. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/6/19. Mailed copy to Plaintiff. (DJP)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy C. Reuter. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/6/19. (DJP) Mailed copy to Plaintiff 3/6/2019 (DJP).
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - TeamCare Active Plan Document, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - First Claim EOB, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Second Claim EOB, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Third Claim EOB, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - First Appeal Response, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Second Appeal Response) (Feist, Jordan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Caitlin M. McNulty to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3004820) by TeamCare, Trustees of the Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing) (Feist, Jordan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney Timothy C. Reuter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3004807) by TeamCare, Trustees of the Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing) (Feist, Jordan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TeamCare, Trustees of the Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund from Minnehaha County, case number 49SMC19-000292. ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3003671) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Small Claims Lawsuit)(DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. TeamCare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TeamCare
Represented By: Jordan J. Feist
Represented By: Timothy C. Reuter
Represented By: Caitlin M. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jordan J. Feist
Represented By: Timothy C. Reuter
Represented By: Caitlin M. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine A. Arnold
Represented By: Joseph A. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?