Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC v. Carstensen Contracting, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC
Defendant: Western Surety Company and Carstensen Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04058
Filed: March 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:18-cv-03211. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue #15 is GRANTED; and 2. This matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of South Dakota, Southern Dvision. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 3/5/2019. (LLM) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 19 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Carstensen Contracting, Inc., Western Surety Company.(Clayton, Lucas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Lucas Clayton in Support of #15 Consent MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Carstensen Contracting, Inc., Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Clayton, Lucas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 Consent MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Carstensen Contracting, Inc., Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Clayton, Lucas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 Consent MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) : Date and time to be determined. (Clayton, Lucas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Carstensen Contracting, Inc., Western Surety Company. (Clayton, Lucas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 Answer REPLY to Counterclaim of Carstensen Contracting filed by Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC. (Peterson, Joshua) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-3211 PAM/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 1/24/2019. (JLB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean B Thomson on behalf of Carstensen Contracting, Inc., Western Surety Company. (Thomson, Dean) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM by Carstensen Contracting, Inc. against Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC. filed by Western Surety Company, Carstensen Contracting, Inc.. (Clayton, Lucas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-only) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Defendants shall have an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Compliant until 21 days following the resolution of Amerons pending motion to dismiss in an action pending in the United States District Court for the District of South Dakota captioned as Case No: 4:18-cv-4067 (RAL). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 12/7/2018. (MME) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Clayton, Lucas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint by Carstensen Contracting, Inc., Western Surety Company. Jointly Signed by Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC. (Clayton, Lucas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC. Western Surety Company served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Peterson, Joshua) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC. Carstensen Contracting, Inc. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Peterson, Joshua) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carstensen Contracting, Inc., Western Surety Company. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-3211 PAM/SER. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carstensen Contracting, Inc., Western Surety Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6501285) filed by Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Peterson, Joshua) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC v. Carstensen Contracting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameron Water Transmission Group, LLC
Represented By: Joshua T. Peterson
Represented By: Patrick J. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Lucas T. Clayton
Represented By: Dean B. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carstensen Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas T. Clayton
Represented By: Dean B. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?