Flying Horse v. Young et al

Petitioner: Joseph R. Flying Horse, Joseph Richard Flying Horse and Flying Horse
Respondent: Darin Young and Jason R. Ravnsborg
Case Number: 4:2019cv04093
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
2 Judge: Daneta Wollmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing service upon respondents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/1/2019. (CG)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 6/10/19. (SB)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Richard Flying Horse re #6 MOTION for Leave to To File Supplement to Petition. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Exhibits 1 & 2 - Kite Request Slip) (CLR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Leave to To File Supplement to Petition filed by Joseph R. Flying Horse. (CLR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Petition by Joseph R. Flying Horse. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplement to Petition, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter) (CLR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Electronically File Documents by Joseph R. Flying Horse. (CLR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph R. Flying Horse. (CLR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Petitioner Joseph R. Flying Horse re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). (SLT)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 New Case LETTER with enclosed Docket Sheet, Motion to Proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Acct. Report sent by Clerk's Office to Joseph R. Flying Horse. (SLT)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Joseph R. Flying Horse. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Authorization) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flying Horse v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph R. Flying Horse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Richard Flying Horse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Flying Horse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason R. Ravnsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?