Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe v. United States Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Hon. Sonny Perdue and Secretary of Agriculture
Case Number: 4:2019cv04094
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/ Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 JUDGMENT. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/1/19. (JLS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #4 Motion for TRO; denying #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/6/2019. (DJP)
June 5, 2019 Filing 25 Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2019 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier.. (Court Reporter: Jill Connelly) (DJP)
June 4, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Sonia N. Jimenez re #23 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Feb. 27, 2019 USDA Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - FSST Written Comments, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 6, 2019 Waiver Request by FSST) (Bailey (USA), Ellie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Bailey (USA), Ellie)
May 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe of Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pearman, Seth)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 05/29/19. (AH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Ronald A. Parson, Jr., United States Attorney on 5/29/2019, filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellie Jean Bailey (USA) on behalf of All Defendants. (Bailey (USA), Ellie)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General on 5/28/2019, filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Stephen Vaden on 5/28/2019, filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Sonny Perdue on 5/28/2019, filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tim Hennessy for Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/24/19. (SRA)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patricia A. Marks for Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/24/19. (SRA)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John M. Peebles for Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/24/19. (SRA)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ben Fenner for Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/24/19. (SRA)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (SLT)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Tim Hennessy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3067720) by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth) Modified on 5/24/2019 to add receipt number (SLT).
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Patricia Marks to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number SDX500005825) by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth) Modified on 5/24/2019 to add receipt number (SLT).
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney John Peebles to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3067702) by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth) Modified on 5/24/2019 to add receipt number (SLT).
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Ben Fenner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3067731) by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth) Modified on 5/24/2019 to add receipt number (SLT).
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Kills-A-Hundred, #2 Declaration of Richard Tall Bear Westerman) (Pearman, Seth)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pearman, Seth)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons, AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85 Form)(JLS)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3067648) filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe in shell case on 5/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tribal Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acknowledgement) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Ellie Jean Bailey (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Sonny Perdue
Represented By: Ellie Jean Bailey (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Agriculture
Represented By: Ellie Jean Bailey (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe
Represented By: Seth C. Pearman
Represented By: John M. Peebles
Represented By: Ben Fenner
Represented By: Tim Hennessy
Represented By: Patricia A. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?