Besmer v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Karla Besmer
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04097
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Discovery Report re #5 Order for Discovery Report (Joint) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Related document: #5 Order for Discovery Report.(Fuller, William)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 07/09/2019. (LH)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Fuller, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Karla Besmer. (Sims, William)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005853) filed by Karla Besmer in shell case on 6/5/2019. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Besmer v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: William P. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Besmer
Represented By: William D. Sims
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?