S. v. Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bridget S.
Defendant: Wellmark, Inc. and Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04098
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 07/08/2019. (KLE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Eden, Shane)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wellmark, Inc. for Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane E. Eden on behalf of Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Wellmark, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Bridget S. (Abourezk, Michael) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (SST).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Bridget S. (Abourezk, Michael) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (SST).
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Summmons(es), AO 85s, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (SST)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005865) filed by Bridget S.. (SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. v. Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget S.
Represented By: Michael C. Abourezk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark, Inc.
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?