Wubben v. Yankton County, South Dakota et al

Plaintiff: Denise Wubben
Defendant: Dan Klimisch and Yankton County, South Dakota
Case Number: 4:2019cv04109
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/19/2019. (CLR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Deinert, Ryland)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Dan Klimisch, Yankton County, South Dakota . (Deinert, Ryland)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryland L. Deinert on behalf of All Defendants. (Deinert, Ryland)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Denise Wubben served on Yankton County, South Dakota. (Wilka, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Denise Wubben served on Daniel J. Klimisch. (Wilka, Thomas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dan Klimisch, Yankton County, South Dakota. 2 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (DLC)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050254) filed by Denise Wubben. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - February 25, 2019 Letter to Denise Wubben, #2 Exhibit B - Yankton County Personnel Handbook) (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wubben v. Yankton County, South Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Klimisch
Represented By: Ryland L. Deinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yankton County, South Dakota
Represented By: Ryland L. Deinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Wubben
Represented By: Sara E. Schroeder
Represented By: Thomas K. Wilka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?