Kuljis v. Saul
Plaintiff: Renee N. Kuljis
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv04110
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Renee N. Kuljis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/23/19. (SKK)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/23/19. (SKK)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Renee N. Kuljis, Andrew M. Saul. (MWT)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of Andrew M. Saul. (Ramsdell, Alison)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO-85)(SRA)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/1/19. (SRA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Renee N. Kuljis. (SRA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Renee N. Kuljis in shell case on 6/27/19. (SRA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuljis v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Alison J. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee N. Kuljis
Represented By: Steven R. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?