Moore v. Graphic Packaging International, LLC.

Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Moore
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04112
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Form 52 Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on August 2, 2019. (DLC)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Graphic Packaging International, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Graphic Packaging International Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate GPI Holding III, LLC, Other Affiliate International Paper Company, Other Affiliate Graphic Packaging Holding Company for Graphic Packaging International, LLC.. (Goldstein, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Graphic Packaging International, LLC.. (Goldstein, David)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO ADMIT NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Katherine L. Nyquist for Graphic Packaging International, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on July 23, 2019. (DLC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Katherine L. Nyquist to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3113655) by Graphic Packaging International, LLC.. (Goldstein, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Goldstein on behalf of Graphic Packaging International, LLC.. (Goldstein, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC. on 07-10-2019 (Pochop, Stephanie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Graphic Packaging International, LLC.. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO-85)(SRA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3096558) filed by Gwendolyn Moore in shell case on 7/1/19. (SRA) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/2/2019) (SRA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Graphic Packaging International, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC.
Represented By: David J. Goldstein
Represented By: Katherine L. Nyquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Moore
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?