Aldridge v. Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.

Plaintiff: Larry Aldridge
Defendant: Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04114
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(CLR)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dan Rasmus for Larry Aldridge. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/5/2019. (CLR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Dan Rasmus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3124606) by Larry Aldridge. (Trzynka, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. for Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane E. Eden on behalf of Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc. served on 7-12-19. (Trzynka, Robert) Modified on 7/31/2019 to correct service date (DJP).
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Northern Division Case Number 1:19-cv-1014. Case assigned to U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. (JLS)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Transfer of Case to the Southern Division. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 7/2/19. (JLS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(SLT)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Larry Aldridge. (Trzynka, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3096449) filed by Larry Aldridge in shell case on 7/1/19. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge v. Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid City Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Aldridge
Represented By: Robert D. Trzynka
Represented By: Dan Rasmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?