Stenseth v. Karpen et al
Plaintiff: Robert A. Stenseth
Defendant: Deb Bowman, State of South Dakota, Department of Social Services, Dr. Greg DeSautel and Julie Karpen
Case Number: 4:2019cv04117
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER Received from Robert A. Stenseth re Robert J Stenseth and Michelle Stenseth addresses. (SLW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Robert A. Stenseth. (DJP)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Robert A. Stenseth. (DJP)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert A. Stenseth re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Receipt for Mailing)(SRA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Electronic Notice by Robert A. Stenseth. Pro se party Robert A. Stenseth will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert A. Stenseth (DJP)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge Lawrence L. Piersol no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/10/19. (SB)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/10/2019. (CLR) Modified on 7/10/2019 delivered to Plaintiff via USPS (CLR).
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with an Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. A new case has been opened. If you are interested in receiving electronic notice of documents filed in your case and/or electronically filing documents in your case, complete and return the enclosed CM/ECF Pro Se Litigation Application Form. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (CLR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Additional Discovery by Robert A. Stenseth. (CLR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert A. Stenseth. (CLR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Robert A. Stenseth. (CLR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Robert A. Stenseth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stenseth v. Karpen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Greg DeSautel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Karpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Stenseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?