Hagen et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Kathy Hagen and Mark Hagen
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04118
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/15/2019. (CLR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Fuller, William)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Director of Division of Insurance on July 7, 2019 Acknowledgement filed by Kathy Hagen, Mark Hagen. (Hoy, Scott)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. 3 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (KLE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050350) filed by Mark Hagen, Kathy Hagen. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagen et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Hagen
Represented By: Scott G. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hagen
Represented By: Scott G. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: William P. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?