Tripp v. Warden of South Dakota State Penitentiary et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Tripp and Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp
Defendant: Attorney General for the State of South Dakota and Warden of South Dakota State Penitentiary
Case Number: 4:2019cv04120
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO #8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kevin Tripp (DLC)
August 29, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #11 Motion to Continue was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Geaghan, Frank)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Continue by Attorney General for the State of South Dakota, Warden of South Dakota State Penitentiary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Indictment) (Geaghan, Frank) Modified on 8/30/2019 (DJP).
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend; filing fee due by October 15, 2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/21/2019. (CG) Modified: mailed to Kevin Tripp on 8/21/2019 (JLS).
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time to Pay Filing Fee by Kevin Tripp. (SKK)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering the parties to show cause by September 13, 2019, why the petition should not be dismissed as unexhausted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/13/2019. (CG)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) was filed in error and should be disregarded (Already filed at doc. #4 ). (SAC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 (Completed Form) filed by Kevin Tripp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SAC) Modified on 8/13/2019 (SAC).
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER Trust Account Report dated 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Additional PTAR dated 7/10/2019, #2 Additional PTAR dated 7/16/2019) (DJP)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Tripp dated 7/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Additional IPF Motion dated 8/1/2019) (DJP)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT (Filled out 2254 form) by Petitioner Kevin Tripp re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Ltr from State Court Clerk forwarding documents to Federal Clerk of Courts, #3 Envelopes) (DJP)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring petitioner to complete 2254 form and file by August 9, 2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/10/2019. (CG) Modified: Mailed to Kevin Tripp, packet previously sent on July 9th on 7/10/2019 (JLS).
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. The 2254 was not in proper form, so a 2254 packet is being included for your completion. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.). Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (JLS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Kevin Tripp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tripp v. Warden of South Dakota State Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General for the State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of South Dakota State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?