East v. Dooley et al
Plaintiff: Donald East
Defendant: LPN Brittany Huber, CO Mastalir, Warden Robert Dooley, PA Brad Adams, CPL. Barta, PA Karissa Zimmer, RN Dayna Klawitter, Jane Does 1 and 2 and 3, Warden Brent Fluke, Other Unknown Persons and Entities and CPL. Ahrens
Case Number: 4:2019cv04126
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Letter re Legal Mail and access to the courts and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald East. (JLS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Brad Adams, Ahrens, Barta, Robert Dooley, Brent Fluke, Brittany Huber, Dayna Klawitter, Mastalir, Karissa Zimmer. 9 Summmons(es), order granting issuance of summons, and complaint delivered to USM via electronic delivery. (SRA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald East. (SRA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Service LETTER with enclosed #7 Order, AO85, Rule 73 Memo, Sample Summons & USM285, Blank Summons and Blank USM285 forms sent by Clerk's Office to Donald East. (JLS)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Screening Case, denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 8/26/19. (JLS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with a Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Motion for Approval to Exceed Page/Word Limitation for Briefs, Filing fee of $350, an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (JLS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (JLS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald East. (JLS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald East. (JLS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Approval to Exceed Page/Word Limitation for Briefs by Donald East. (JLS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand ($350.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050424) filed by Donald East. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East v. Dooley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Brittany Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Mastalir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Robert Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Brad Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPL. Barta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Karissa Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Dayna Klawitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1 and 2 and 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brent Fluke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Persons and Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPL. Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?