Bunker et al v. CIGNA Health Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Bunker and Jack Bunker
Defendant: CIGNA Health Management, Inc., Arlington Care and Rehabilition Center, LLC and Skyline Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04128
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Reissued as to Skyline Healthcare, LLC. (SLW)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by Cheryl Bunker, Jack Bunker. (Show, Sara)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Reissued as to Arlington Care and Rehabilition Center, LLC, Skyline Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Skyline Healthcare, LLC - Glubka, #2 Skyline Healthcare, LLC - Schwartz, #3 Arlington Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC - Glubka, #4 Arlington Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC - Schwartz, #5 AO85 Form)(JLS)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by Cheryl Bunker, Jack Bunker. (Show, Sara)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Strike filed by CIGNA Health Management, Inc.. (Linde, Paul)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF by Plaintiffs Cheryl Bunker, Jack Bunker re #11 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint JURY DEMAND (Show, Sara)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Plaintiffs Cheryl Bunker, Jack Bunker on Corporation Service Co. (Registered Agent for Defendant Black Hills Receiver, LLC) (Show, Sara)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Plaintiffs Cheryl Bunker, Jack Bunker on CT Corporation Systems (Registered Agent for Defendant Cigna Health Management, Inc.) (Show, Sara)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint JURY DEMAND filed by CIGNA Health Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Plan Description) (Linde, Paul)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint JURY DEMAND by CIGNA Health Management, Inc.. (Linde, Paul)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter E. Pederson for CIGNA Health Management, Inc. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/5/2019. (CLR)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel K. Ryan for CIGNA Health Management, Inc. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/5/2019. (CLR)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/5/2019. (CLR)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Linde on behalf of CIGNA Health Management, Inc.. (Linde, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Peter E. Pederson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3139649) by CIGNA Health Management, Inc.. (Linde, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3139635) by CIGNA Health Management, Inc.. (Linde, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Extend re #1 Complaint by CIGNA Health Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Linde, Paul)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 5 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons - BLACK HILLS RECEIVER, LLC, #2 Summons - CIGNA Health Management, Inc., #3 Summons - Skyline Healthcare, LLC, #4 Summons - Skyline Healthcare, LLC, #5 Summons - Arlington Care and Rehabilition Center, LLC, #6 AO 85)(SRA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Jack Bunker. (Show, Sara)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050446) filed by Jack Bunker, Cheryl Bunker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Decision Summary) (SRA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunker et al v. CIGNA Health Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Bunker
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Bunker
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Health Management, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Represented By: Paul H. Linde
Represented By: Peter E. Pederson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlington Care and Rehabilition Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?