Warren v. JWC, et al
Petitioner: Christopher Warren
Respondent: Mr. JWC, Administrator and Director
Case Number: 4:2019cv04129
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/4/2019. (CLR) Modified on 9/4/2019 delivered to Christopher Warren via US Postal Service (CLR).
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to DISMISS 2241 WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Christopher Warren. (CLR)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Response due by 9/18/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/28/2019. (CG) Modified on 8/29/2019. Sent to Christopher Warren via USPS (SKK).
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Administrator, Director, Mr. JWC. (Druley (USA), Delia)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by Christopher Warren. (CLR)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 PETITIONER'S RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Extend Deadlines filed by Christopher Warren. (CLR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Respondents' responses to the petition and pending motion for preliminary injunction due by 9/4/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/19/2019. (CG) Modified on 8/19/2019. Sent to Christopher Warren via USPS (SKK).
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Administrator, Director, Mr. JWC. (Druley (USA), Delia)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of Administrator, Director, Mr. JWC. (Druley (USA), Delia)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE as to all Respondents served on U.S. Attorney General/U.S. Dept. of Justice. (CLR)
August 7, 2019 Filing Fee Received from Christopher Warren. Fee Amount: $5.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400050545. (CLR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Petitioner Christopher Warren re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Time Computation Sheet) (CLR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher Warren. (CLR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Clerk (SKK)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for service upon respondents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/30/2019. (CG)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet, motion to proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account form sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (CLR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Christopher Warren re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D) (CLR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Christopher Warren. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. JWC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. JWC
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Administrator
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?