Frazier v. Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
Plaintiff: Jean Frazier
Defendant: Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
Case Number: 4:2019cv04132
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/24/2020 Motions due by 5/29/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on September 20, 2019. (DLC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Jean Frazier.(Nelsen, Derek)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on September 16, 2019. (DLC) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/16/2019) (DLC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Letter to Counsel) (DLC).
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. (Travis, Richard)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Travis on behalf of All Defendants. (Travis, Richard)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Jean Frazier. (Nelsen, Derek)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(DLC) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2019) (DLC).
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3119213) filed by Jean Frazier in shell case on 07/29/19. (Attachments: #1 H&H Roofing letter) (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
Represented By: Richard L. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Frazier
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?