Jorgenson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jason Jorgenson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv04133
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Extend. Mr. Tupman's affidavit shall be filed by October 7, 2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/4/2019. (CG) Modified on 9/5/2019 - Mailed copy to Jason Jorgenson (SAC).
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Extend Time for Former Defense Counsel to File Responsive Affidavit by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by United States of America (Bengford, Stephanie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 Attorney-Client Privilege Waiver by Jason Jorgenson. (SLW)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 4:17-cr-40043-01 filed by Jason Jorgenson. (SAC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend petition. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/20/2019. (CG) DELIVERED copy to Jason Jorgenson on 8/22/2019 via USPS (SAC).
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Jason Jorgenson. (SLW)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Jason Jorgenson. (SLW)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Jason Jorgenson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Petition) (SLW)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 waiver form) (CG)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for service upon respondents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/5/2019. (CG)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (SLW)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 17-40043-01 filed by Jason Jorgenson. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jorgenson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Koliner
Represented By: Stephanie C. Bengford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?