Larson v. Mills Aftermarket Accessories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pamela Larson
Defendant: Mills Aftermarket Accessories, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04136
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Discovery Report re #6 Order for Discovery Report by Pamela Larson. Related document: #6 Order for Discovery Report.(Sherrill, Tracye)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(MWT)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Jorgenson, Jade)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Plaintiff Pamela Larson on Radco Truck Accessories, Inc. d/b/a Radco Truck Accessory Center (Sherrill, Tracye)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jade B. Jorgenson on behalf of Mills Aftermarket Accessories, Inc.. (Jorgenson, Jade)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mills Aftermarket Accessories, Inc.. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Mills Aftermarket Accessories, Inc., #2 AO85 form)(JLS)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3126532) filed by Pamela Larson in shell case on 8/6/19. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. Mills Aftermarket Accessories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mills Aftermarket Accessories, Inc.
Represented By: Jade B. Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Larson
Represented By: Tracye L. Sherrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?