Kiir v. Young et al
Petitioner: Diw Kiir and Diw Bol Kiir
Respondent: U.S. Attorney General, Darin Young and South Dakota Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2019cv04139
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (case has been dismissed and closed). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/22/2019. (CG) Modified on 8/22/2019. Sent to Diw Kiir via USPS (SKK).
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Without Payment of Fees and Declaration by Diw Kiir. (CLR)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/15/2019. (CLR) Modified on 8/15/2019 delivered to Petitioner with Appeal Packet via US Postal Service(CLR).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration. Copy of docket sheet and motion to proceed IFP sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (CLR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (CLR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Diw Kiir. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service) (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiir v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diw Kiir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diw Bol Kiir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: South Dakota Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?