Metabank v. Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Metabank
Defendant: Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04140
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on October 7, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(DLC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC for Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC. (Crayne, Ryan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC. (Crayne, Ryan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason C. Smith. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/27/19. (SKK) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/30/2019) (SKK).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Seitz. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/27/19. (SKK) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/30/2019) (SKK).
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Jason C. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3161907) by Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC. (Crayne, Ryan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Michael W. Seitz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3161902) by Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC. (Crayne, Ryan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC . (Crayne, Ryan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan K. Crayne on behalf of Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC. (Crayne, Ryan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons / Complaint served on Becky DeGeorge, Authorized Agent on 08/23/2019, filed by Metabank. (Peterson, Mitchell)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85)(SAC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3130249) filed by Metabank in shell case on 08/12/2019. (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metabank v. Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metabank
Represented By: Mitchell A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Barbara Tax Products Group, LLC
Represented By: Ryan K. Crayne
Represented By: Jason C. Smith
Represented By: Michael W. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?