Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Caballero et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Banco Continental S.A., Inversiones Continental (Panama), S.A. DE C.V., Michael I. Janis, Grupo Continental, Marc Gonsalves, Richard Pescatore, John Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Carolyn Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Banco Hondurus, Jada Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Frank Pescatore Sr., Government of Hondurus, Jarrod Pescatore, Keith Stansell, Greer Janis, Antonio Caballero, Thomas Howes, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith Janis, Olivia Pescatore, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Government of Honduras, Judith G. Janis, Banco Continental S.A., Hondurus and Banco Hondurus, S.A.
Intervenor Defendant: Banco de los Trabajadores
Case Number: 4:2019cv04141
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE by Banco de los Trabajadores Second Notice of Bankruptcy Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bank Court Order regarding Recognition)(Bell, Stephen)
February 28, 2020 Filing 81 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Antonio Caballero re #80 Notice OF BANKRUPTCY STAY. (Myers, James)
February 28, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE by Banco de los Trabajadores of Bankruptcy Stay. (Bell, Stephen)
February 25, 2020 Filing 79 JUDGMENT in favor of Banco Continental S.A., Government of Honduras, Inversiones Continental (Panama), S.A. DE C.V., Antonio Caballero, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Carolyn Pescatore, Christopher T. Janis, Frank Pescatore Sr., Greer C. Janis, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jonathan N. Janis, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Thomas Howes against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 02/25/2020. (SAC)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER AND DISMISSING CASE denying #23 Motion to Change Venue; denying as moot #28 Motion for Leave to ; denying as moot #32 Motion to Intervene; denying as moot #37 Motion to Stay; denying as moot #41 Motion ; denying as moot #61 Motion ; denying as moot #66 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 02/25/2020. (SAC)
February 25, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #74 Reply was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Bell, Stephen)
February 21, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE by Antonio Caballero OF FILING OBJECTIONS TO CHAPTER 15 PETITION AND OPPOSITION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Antonio Caballero's Objections and Opposition)(Myers, James)
February 14, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE by Antonio Caballero OF FILING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IN CHAPTER 15 BANKRUPTCY ACTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Antonio Caballero's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Myers, James)
January 24, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE by Banco de los Trabajadores . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chapter 15 Petition)(Bell, Stephen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 74 (FILED IN ERROR) REPLY to motion response re: #32 Motion to Intervene filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen) Modified on 1/24/2020 to correct link (CLR). Modified on 2/25/2020 (CLR).
January 16, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE by Banco de los Trabajadores . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evasio Asencio, #2 Exhibit 1 - OFAC Kingpin Act Designations, #3 Exhibit 2 - Resolution SB No. 1034 09-10-2015, #4 Exhibit 3 - Article 120, Honduran Financial System Law , #5 Exhibit 4(a) - Resolution SB 113 15-02-2017, #6 Exhibit 4(b) - Trust and Administration Agreement, #7 Exhibit 5 - Article 1035, Honduran Code of Commerce, #8 Exhibit 6 - Article 1036, Honduran Code of Commerce, #9 Exhibit 7(a) - OFAC General License 1, #10 Exhibit 7(b) - OFAC General License 1A, #11 Exhibit 7(c) - OFAC General License 1B, #12 Exhibit 7(d) - OFAC General License 1C, #13 Declaration of Oscar Lagos V., #14 Exhibit 1 - Trust and Administration Agreement, #15 Exhibit 2 - Article 1036, Honduran Code of Commerce, #16 Exhibit 3 - Article 131, Honduran Financial System Law, #17 Exhibit 4 - Article 120, Honduran Financial System Law )(Bell, Stephen) Modified on 1/17/2020 to add descriptions (CLR).
January 3, 2020 Filing 72 SUPPLEMENT by Choose Party Type Banco de los Trabajadores re #32 MOTION to Intervene . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Ex. 1 - Winerman Email) (Bell, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 71 REPLY to #70 Response to Motion, IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE STANSELL AND PESCATORE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of McBrien, #2 Exhibit Dr. Bagley's Curriculum Vitae, #3 Exhibit 10-23-2019 OFAC Correspondence) (Myers, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #66 First MOTION to Strike #63 Supplement,, filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Frank Pescatore Sr., Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
December 5, 2019 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #61 MOTION Request for Status Conference filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen)
December 5, 2019 Filing 68 REPLY to Motion Response re #61 MOTION Request for Status Conference filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles Nicholas Rostow for Antonio Caballero. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/22/2019. (SAC)
November 21, 2019 Filing 66 First MOTION to Strike #63 Supplement,, by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion to Strike) (Zellmer, Joshua)
November 21, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Attorney Nicholas Rostow to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3200578) by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zellmer, Joshua)
November 21, 2019 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #61 MOTION Request for Status Conference filed by Antonio Caballero. (Myers, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Keith Stansell, Defendants - Estate Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carolyn Pescatore, John Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Frank Pescatore Sr. - ATA Judgment Creditors' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DOJ Press Release, #2 Exhibit 2 - Indictment) (Billion, Timothy)
November 20, 2019 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re #61 MOTION Request for Status Conference filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fritz, Daniel)
November 18, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION Request for Status Conference by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen)
November 18, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY to #37 Motion to Stay filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen)
November 18, 2019 Filing 59 REPLY to #32 Motion to Intervene filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen)
November 18, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY to #41 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief INTERPLEADER PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGOS MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF ANY ACTIONS AFFECTING THE CONTESTED FUNDS IN THE INTERPLEADER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2361 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fritz, Daniel)
November 18, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY to #28 Motion for Leave to filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fritz, Daniel)
November 18, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 MOTION to Intervene , #37 MOTION to Stay filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fritz, Daniel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Stay filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Frank Pescatore Sr., Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 MOTION for Leave to Amend First Amended Interpleader Complaint filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Frank Pescatore Sr., Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION INTERPLEADER PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGOS MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF ANY ACTIONS AFFECTING THE CONTESTED FUNDS IN THE INTERPLEADER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2361 filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Frank Pescatore Sr., Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
November 12, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Motion Response re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fritz, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Juan Basombrio for Banco de los Trabajadores. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/12/2019. (SAC)
November 12, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Timothy W. Billion re #49 Reply to Motion Response, in Support of Motion to Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amicus Curiae Brief) (Billion, Timothy)
November 12, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY to Motion Response re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Frank Pescatore Sr., Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
November 11, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney Juan Basombrio to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3191827) by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen)
November 7, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Intervene filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Answer to 1st Amended Complaint and Crossclaim) (Bell, Stephen)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #33 Memorandum in Support of Motion was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Bell, Stephen)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/06/2019. (SAC)
November 5, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE to #41 Motion PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGOS MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF ANY ACTIONS AFFECTING THE CONTESTED FUNDS IN THE INTERPLEADER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2361 filed by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Entry of Turnover Judgment in Case 1:10-mc-00471-TJK) (Myers, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Leave to Amend First Amended Interpleader Complaint filed by Antonio Caballero. (Myers, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Intervene , #37 MOTION to Stay filed by Antonio Caballero. (Myers, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 MOTION INTERPLEADER PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGOS MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF ANY ACTIONS AFFECTING THE CONTESTED FUNDS IN THE INTERPLEADER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2361 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fritz, Daniel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION INTERPLEADER PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGOS MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF ANY ACTIONS AFFECTING THE CONTESTED FUNDS IN THE INTERPLEADER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2361 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fritz, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jack F. Huerter for Government of Honduras. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/30/2019. (SAC)
October 29, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #37 MOTION to Stay filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 38 PROPOSED ORDER by Banco de los Trabajadores re #37 MOTION to Stay (Bell, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION in Support re #32 MOTION to Intervene of Jack Huerter filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Treasury Stmt on Liquidation, #2 Exhibit B - El Tiempo Article, #3 Exhibit C - Tico Times Article, #4 Exhibit D - Treasury Sanctions Rosenthal Money Laundering Organization) (Bell, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION in Support re #32 MOTION to Intervene of Oscar Lagos V. filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Copy of Public Deed, #2 Exhibit 2 - Code of Commerce Article 1036, #3 Exhibit 3 - Financial System Law 0 Art 131 Ranking Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Financial System Law 0 Art 120 Designation of Liquidators) (Bell, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION in Support re #32 MOTION to Intervene of Evasio Asencio filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Kingpin Act Designations, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certification, #3 Exhibit 3 - Financial System Law Article 120, #4 Exhibit 4a - Certification re Minutes of Session 1092, #5 Exhibit 4b - Certified Copy of Public Deed, #6 Exhibit 5 - Code of Commerce Article 1035, #7 Exhibit 6 - Code of Commerce Article 1036, #8 Exhibit 7a - Ofc of Foreign Assets Control 31 CFR Part 598-1, #9 Exhibit 7b - Ofc of Foreign Assets Control 31 CFR Part 598-1a, #10 Exhibit 7c - Ofc of Foreign Assets Control 31 CFR Part 598-1b, #11 Exhibit 7d - Ofc of Foreign Assets Control 31 CFR Part 598-1c) (Bell, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 33 (FILED IN ERROR) MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Intervene filed by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Bell, Stephen) Modified on 11/8/2019 (CLR).
October 29, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Intervene by Banco de los Trabajadores. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bell, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney Jack Huerter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3183870) by Government of Honduras. (Bell, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION for Leave to Amend First Amended Interpleader Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Rahn, Timothy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 29 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Amendment to #28 MOTION for Leave to Amend First Amended Interpleader Complaint , #6 Amended Complaint, (Rahn, Timothy) Modified on 10/29/2019 (CLR).
October 29, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Amend First Amended Interpleader Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Rahn, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2019: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (CLR).
October 29, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #29 Amended Document was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Rahn, Timothy)
October 28, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Antonio Caballero. (Myers, James)
October 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Seal Document by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Inversiones Continental (Panama), S.A. DE C.V., Christopher T. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Doc.) (SAC)
October 22, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Timothy W. Billion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal) (Billion, Timothy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/6/2019) (SAC).
October 21, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Change Venue Because of Improper Venue filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Frank Pescatore Sr., Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Frank Pescatore Sr., Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy W. Billion on behalf of Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Frank Pescatore Sr.. (Billion, Timothy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Antonio Caballero re #20 Brief, INTERPLEADER DEFENDANT ANTONIO CABALLERO'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY. (Myers, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF by Defendant Antonio Caballero re #14 Response to Motion, #7 MOTION to DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER OF GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6), FED. R. CIV. P. (Myers, James)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tony Korvick for Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/17/2019. (SAC)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Newton P. Porter for Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/17/2019. (SAC)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy W. Billion on behalf of Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Tony Korvick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3174164) by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Newton P. Porter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3174155) by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Billion, Timothy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER OF GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6), FED. R. CIV. P. filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fritz, Daniel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Bell on behalf of Government of Honduras. (Bell, Stephen)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph I. Zumpano for Antonio Caballero. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/20/2019. (SLT)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Leon N. Patricios for Antonio Caballero. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/20/2019. (SLT)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Joseph I. Zumpano to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3156587) by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admitting Nonresident Attorney) (Zellmer, Joshua)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Leon N. Patricios to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3156584) by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admitting Nonresident Attorney) (Zellmer, Joshua)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF by Defendant Antonio Caballero re #7 MOTION to DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER OF GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6), FED. R. CIV. P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stansell Motion for Issuance of Banco Continental Writ, #2 Exhibit Wells Fargo's Turnover Judgment, #3 Exhibit Wells Fargo's Turnover Judgment, #4 Exhibit OFAC General License, #5 Exhibit OFAC's Specially Designated Nationals List, #6 Exhibit OFAC Statement on Proposed Liquidation of Banco Continental) (Myers, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER OF GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6), FED. R. CIV. P. by Antonio Caballero. (Myers, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Pescatore Banco Continental Writ Issued Nov 30 2018, served Dec 4, 2018, #2 Exhibit B- Caballero Summons for Garnishment and Admission of Service 4/21/18, #3 Exhibit C- Stansell Banco Continental Writ issued 8/27/19, served 9/6/19) (Fritz, Daniel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF by Defendant Antonio Caballero re #4 MOTION to DISMISS COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER OF GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6), FED. R. CIV. P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OFAC General License No. 1C, #2 Exhibit US Department of Treasury Kingpin Act Designations, #3 Exhibit OFAC Statement on Proposed Liquidation of Banco Continental) (Myers, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER OF GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6), FED. R. CIV. P. by Antonio Caballero. (Myers, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Myers on behalf of Antonio Caballero. (Myers, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85)(SAC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER OF GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050604) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (SAC) Modified on 8/14/2019 (SAC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Caballero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Continental S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inversiones Continental (Panama), S.A. DE C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael I. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Continental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Gonsalves
Represented By: Newton P. Porter
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Represented By: Tony Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Pescatore
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Pescatore
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Hondurus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jada Pescatore
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Pescatore Harpster
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Pescatore Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of Hondurus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Pescatore
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Stansell
Represented By: Newton P. Porter
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Represented By: Tony Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greer Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Caballero
Represented By: Leon N. Patricios
Represented By: James R. Myers
Represented By: Joseph I. Zumpano
Represented By: Joshua D. Zellmer
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Rostow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Howes
Represented By: Newton P. Porter
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Represented By: Tony Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan N. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Pescatore
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher T. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greer C. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of Honduras
Represented By: Stephen D. Bell
Represented By: Jack F. Huerter
Represented By: Juan Basombrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith G. Janis
Represented By: Newton P. Porter
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Represented By: Tony Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Continental S.A., Hondurus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Hondurus, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Timothy R. Rahn
Represented By: Daniel R. Fritz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Banco de los Trabajadores
Represented By: Stephen D. Bell
Represented By: Juan Basombrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?