Garza-Montenegro v. Cox et al
Petitioner: Gerardo Garza-Montenegro
Respondent: Warden JW Cox and Director
Case Number: 4:2019cv04145
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Motion Response re #10 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by JW Cox, Director. (Druley (USA), Delia)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY and Objection to #10 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gerardo Garza-Montenegro. (CLR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Tawana Ingram re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 Statement of Material Facts, #10 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Program Statement, #2 Exhibit B - Public Information Inmate Data, #3 Exhibit C - Inmate Discipline Data, #4 Exhibit D - Incident Report, #5 Exhibit E - Inmate Rights at Discipline Hearing, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Discipline Hearing, #7 Exhibit G - DHO Report) (Druley (USA), Delia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS re #10 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by JW Cox, Director. (Druley (USA), Delia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by JW Cox, Director. (Druley (USA), Delia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by JW Cox, Director. (Druley (USA), Delia)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Respondent's response due by 9/26/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/16/2019. (CG)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Deadlines to Repond to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by JW Cox, Director. (Druley (USA), Delia)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT for service of #4 and #5 (DLC)
August 30, 2019 Filing Fee Received from Gerardo Garza-Montenegro. Fee Amount: $5.00, Receipt No.: #SDX300003273. (CLR)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of JW Cox, Director. (Druley (USA), Delia)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Clerk (DLC)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing service upon respondents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/23/2019. (CG)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet, motion to proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account form sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (SLT)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Gerardo Garza-Montenegro re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241). (SLT)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Gerardo Garza-Montenegro. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza-Montenegro v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden JW Cox
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerardo Garza-Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?