Wright v. Lawrence
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright
Defendant: Kelvin Lawrence
Case Number: 4:2019cv04149
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott J. Strohm for Jon Q. Wright. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/12/2019. (CLR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney SCOTT J. STROHM to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3151618) by Jon Q. Wright. (Peterson, Mitchell)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/REPORT on Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. Delivered to U.S. Copyright Office via U.S. Postal Service. (CLR)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kelvin Lawrence. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and an AO 85 for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3142300) filed by Jon Q. Wright in shell case on 8/28/2019. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright
Represented By: Mitchell A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?